Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Francesco Cuccarese

Archbishop Emeritus of Pescara-Penne, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Mar 1930 Born
19 Jul 195323.3Ordained PriestPriest
12 Feb 197948.9AppointedArchbishop of Acerenza, Italy
1 Apr 197949.0Ordained BishopArchbishop of Acerenza, Italy
6 Jun 198757.2AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Caserta, Italy
21 Apr 199060.1AppointedArchbishop of Pescara-Penne, Italy
4 Nov 200575.6RetiredArchbishop of Pescara-Penne, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Cuccarese
Archbishop Francesco Cuccarese (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Pescara-Penne

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTursi, Diocese of Tursi-Lagonegro
Ordained BishopAssumption, Cathedral, Tursi, Diocese of Tursi-Lagonegro

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Pescara-Penne.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 4 Nov 2005
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133
  • ob/c24: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 56, Number 4,127
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 74, Number 5,924

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast