Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Maurice Anthony Crowley, S.P.S.

Bishop of Kitale, Kenya


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 May 1946 Born
4 Jun 197226.0Ordained PriestPriest of St. Patrick’s Society for the Foreign Missions
3 Apr 199851.8AppointedBishop of Kitale, Kenya
15 Aug 199852.2Ordained BishopBishop of Kitale, Kenya
22 Nov 201771.5AppointedApostolic Administrator of Eldoret, Kenya
1 Feb 202073.7CeasedApostolic Administrator of Eldoret, Kenya

MicroData Summary for Maurice Anthony Crowley
Bishop Maurice Anthony Crowley S.P.S. (born ) Bishop of Kitale

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBerrings
Ordained PriestKillamoate
Ordained BishopAgricultural Show grounds, Kitale, Diocese of Kitale

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Kitale.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Number 13,369
  • c1: CB, 23 Jun 2017
  • ab: CB, 22 Nov 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast