Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ubaldo Evaristo Cibrián Fernández, C.P. †

Deceased

Prelate of Corocoro, Bolivia

Titular Bishop of Bida


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Dec 1906Born
21 Sep 192922.7Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Passion
7 Mar 195346.2AppointedPrelate of Corocoro, Bolivia
7 Mar 195346.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Bida
17 May 195346.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bida
14 Apr 196558.3DiedPrelate of Corocoro, Bolivia

MicroData Summary for Ubaldo Evaristo Cibrián Fernández
Bishop Ubaldo Evaristo Cibrián Fernández C.P. (born , died ) Prelate of Corocoro

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVillanueva de Odra, Spain

  • a priest for 35.5 years
  • a bishop for 11.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 61, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast