Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Peter Nworie Chukwu

Bishop-Elect of Abakaliki, Nigeria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Nov 1965 Born
3 Jul 199327.6Ordained PriestPriest of Abakaliki, Nigeria
6 Jul 202155.6AppointedBishop of Abakaliki, Nigeria
19 Aug 202155.7Ordained BishopBishop of Abakaliki, Nigeria

MicroData Summary for Peter Nworie Chukwu
Father Peter Nworie Chukwu (born ) Bishop-Elect of Abakaliki

EventPlace
Birth PlaceEdedeagu Umuezekohohu, Diocese of Ogoja
Ordained BishopSaint Theresa, Cathedral, Abakaliki, Diocese of Abakaliki

Please contact the Father through the Diocese of Abakaliki.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 6 Jul 2021
  • ob: CB, 12 Jul 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 13 Jul 2021

Quantcast