Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Peter Chung Hoan Ting

Archbishop Emeritus of Kuching, Malaysia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Sep 1928 Born
26 Sep 195426.0Ordained PriestPriest
1 Sep 197041.9AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Kota Kinabalu, Malaysia
1 Sep 197041.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Acelum
15 Nov 197042.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Acelum
197243.3SucceededVicar Apostolic of Kota Kinabalu, Malaysia
30 Jan 197546.3AppointedVicar Apostolic of Kuching, Malaysia
31 May 197647.7AppointedArchbishop of Kuching, Malaysia
21 Jun 200374.7RetiredArchbishop of Kuching, Malaysia

MicroData Summary for Peter Chung Hoan Ting
Archbishop Peter Chung Hoan Ting (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Kuching

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLuinchi
Ordained BishopSacré-Cœur, Kota Kinbalu, Vicariate Apostolic of Kota Kinabalu

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Kuching.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • ab/vica/k378: Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 67, Page 208
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 14, Number 740

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast