Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Willem Christiaans, O.S.F.S.

Bishop of Keetmanshoop, Namibia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Feb 1961 Born
23 Jan 198321.9First VowsMember of Oblates of St. Francis de Sales
23 Jan 198826.9Perpetual VowsMember of Oblates of St. Francis de Sales
10 Dec 198827.8Ordained PriestPriest of Oblates of St. Francis de Sales
26 Jul 201756.4AppointedAdministrator of Keetmanshoop, Namibia
7 Feb 201856.9AppointedBishop of Keetmanshoop, Namibia
5 May 201857.2Ordained BishopBishop of Keetmanshoop, Namibia

MicroData Summary for Willem Christiaans
Bishop Willem Christiaans O.S.F.S. (born ) Bishop of Keetmanshoop

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGabis, Vicariate Apostolic of Keetmanshoop
Ordained BishopKeetmanshoop Stadium, Keetmanshoop, Diocese of Keetmanshoop

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Keetmanshoop.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 7 Feb 2018
  • ob: CB, 21 Feb 2018
  • c2: CB, 27 Apr 2018
  • c34: CB, 4 May 2018
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 236, Number 19,775

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast