Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Tulio Manuel Chirivella Varela

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Barquisimeto, Venezuela


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Nov 1932Born
11 Nov 195623.9Ordained PriestPriest of Barquisimeto, Venezuela
5 Apr 197441.3AppointedBishop of Margarita, Venezuela
9 Jun 197441.5Ordained BishopBishop of Margarita, Venezuela
18 Oct 198249.9AppointedArchbishop of Barquisimeto, Venezuela
11 Dec 198250.0InstalledArchbishop of Barquisimeto, Venezuela
22 Dec 200775.1RetiredArchbishop of Barquisimeto, Venezuela
10 Apr 202188.4DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Barquisimeto, Venezuela

MicroData Summary for Tulio Manuel Chirivella Varela
Archbishop Tulio Manuel Chirivella Varela (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Barquisimeto

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAguirre
Ordained BishopSocorro, Cathedral, Valencia, Diocese of Valencia en Venezuela
Death PlaceMiami, Archdiocese of Miami, Florida, USA

  • a priest for 64.4 years
  • a bishop for 46.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 22 Dec 2007
  • d: CB, 25 Aug 2019
  • ~d: CB, 26 Aug 2019
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 25, Number 1,422
  • d: CB, 11 Apr 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 11 Apr 2021

Quantcast