Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alexandre (Sandor) Chira

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Mukachevo (Munkács) (Ruthenian), Ukraine


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Jan 1897Born
18 Dec 192023.9Ordained PriestPriest of Mukachevo (Munkács) (Ruthenian), Ukraine
Sep 1944²47.6Ordained BishopAuxiliary Bishop of Mukachevo (Munkács) (Ruthenian), Ukraine
26 May 198386.3DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Mukachevo (Munkács) (Ruthenian), Ukraine

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Alexandre (Sandor) Chira
Bishop Alexandre (Sandor) Chira (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Mukachevo (Munkács)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVul'hivtsi, Eparchy of Mukachevo (Munkács) (Ruthenian)
Ordained BishopUzhorod
Death PlaceKaragonda

  • a priest for 62.4 years
  • a bishop for 38.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 122, Number 10,948
  • op: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 117, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 125, Number 11,255
  • c1: CB, 19 May 2015
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 59, Number 4,417
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 86, Number 7,181

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast