Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Anton Anhelovych (Angellowicz)

Deceased

Archbishop of Lviv (Ukrainian), Ukraine


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Apr 1756Born
2 Apr 178326.9Ordained PriestPriest of Lviv (Ukrainian), Ukraine
1796¹39.7AppointedBishop of Przemyśl, Sambor, et Sanok (Ukrainian), Poland
14 Feb 179639.8Ordained BishopBishop of Przemyśl, Sambor, et Sanok (Ukrainian), Poland
1804²47.7AppointedAdministrator of Chełm (Ukrainian), Poland
16 Mar 180851.9AppointedArchbishop of Lviv (Ukrainian), Ukraine
1810²53.7ResignedAdministrator of Chełm (Ukrainian), Poland
9 Aug 181458.3DiedArchbishop of Lviv (Ukrainian), Ukraine

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Anton Anhelovych (Angellowicz)
Archbishop Anton Anhelovych (Angellowicz) (born , died ) Archbishop of Lviv

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHryniv, Eparchy of Lviv (Ukrainian)
Ordained BishopLviv, Eparchy of Lviv (Ukrainian)

  • a priest for 31.3 years
  • a bishop for 18.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 178, Number 14,771
  • ob/c23: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,505
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 237
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 202, Number 16,612
  • b: Hierarchy of the Kyivan Church 861-1990, Page 274, and Page 304
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1796, Number 1
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 55, Number 4,011
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 76, Number 6,102
  • bd/bp: CB, 14 Apr 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 16 Apr 2021

Quantcast