Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Allan Chamgwera

Bishop Emeritus of Zomba, Malawi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Apr 1928 Born
7 Sep 195729.3Ordained PriestPriest
12 Feb 198152.7AppointedBishop of Zomba, Malawi
31 May 198153.0Ordained BishopBishop of Zomba, Malawi
17 Jan 200475.7RetiredBishop of Zomba, Malawi

MicroData Summary for Allan Chamgwera
Bishop Allan Chamgwera (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Zomba

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNkhonjiwa
Ordained BishopZomba, Diocese of Zomba

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Zomba.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 78, Number 6,343

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast