Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carlito Joaquin Cenzon, C.I.C.M. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Baguio, Philippines


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Jan 1939Born
9 Jul 196526.4Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Immaculate Heart of Mary
6 Jul 199253.4AppointedVicar Apostolic of Tabuk, Philippines
6 Jul 199253.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Scebatiana
25 Nov 199253.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Scebatiana
25 Jan 200263.0AppointedVicar Apostolic of Baguio, Philippines
10 Jul 200465.4AppointedBishop of Baguio, Philippines
1 Oct 201677.6RetiredBishop of Baguio, Philippines
26 Jun 201980.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Baguio, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Carlito Joaquin Cenzon
Bishop Carlito Joaquin Cenzon C.I.C.M. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Baguio

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBaguio
Ordained BishopOur Lady of Atonement, Cathedral, Baguio City, Diocese of Baguio
Death PlaceSt. Luke's, Hospital, Quezon City, Diocese of Baguio
Buried Place (Original)Maryhurst Seminary CICM, Cemetery, Lucnab, Baguio City, Diocese of Baguio

  • a priest for 53.9 years
  • a bishop for 26.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133, Number 11,986
  • mn: CB, 19 Jul 2015
  • obp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 224, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • r: Bollettino, 1 Oct 2016
  • d: CB, 26 Jun 2019
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 242, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast