Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Erio Castellucci

Archbishop of Modena-Nonantola, Italy

Bishop of Carpi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Jul 1960 Born
5 May 198423.8Ordained PriestPriest of Forli, Italy
3 Jun 201554.9AppointedArchbishop of Modena-Nonantola, Italy
12 Sep 201555.1Ordained BishopArchbishop of Modena-Nonantola, Italy
13 Sep 201555.1InstalledArchbishop of Modena-Nonantola, Italy
26 Jun 201958.9AppointedApostolic Administrator of Carpi, Italy
7 Dec 202060.4AppointedBishop of Carpi, Italy
1 Jan 202160.4InstalledBishop of Carpi, Italy

MicroData Summary for Erio Castellucci
Archbishop Erio Castellucci (born ) Archbishop of Modena-Nonantola

EventPlace
Birth PlaceForlě, Diocese of Forli
Ordained BishopPalafiera di Forli, Forlě, Diocese of Forli-Bertinoro

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Modena-Nonantola.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 3 Jun 2015
  • ob/i: CB, 10 Jun 2015
  • c23: CB, 12 Jun 2015
  • c34: CB, 12 Sep 2015
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 224, Number 18,575
  • ab: Bollettino, 26 Jun 2019
  • ab: Bollettino, 7 Dec 2020
  • i: CB, 31 Dec 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.1, 10 Dec 2020; Data: 1 Jan 2021

Quantcast