Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pedro Casaldáliga Plá, C.M.F. †

Deceased

Prelate Emeritus of São Félix, Mato Grosso, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Feb 1928Born
31 May 195224.2Ordained PriestPriest of Missionary Sons of the Immaculate Heart of Mary
27 Apr 197042.1AppointedApostolic Administrator of São Félix, Mato Grosso, Brazil
27 Aug 197143.5AppointedPrelate of São Félix, Mato Grosso, Brazil
27 Aug 197143.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Altava
23 Oct 197143.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Altava
26 May 197850.2ResignedTitular Bishop of Altava
2 Feb 200576.9RetiredPrelate of São Félix, Mato Grosso, Brazil
8 Aug 202092.4DiedPrelate Emeritus of São Félix, Mato Grosso, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Pedro Casaldáliga Plá (VIAF: 17220283)
Bishop Pedro Casaldáliga Plá C.M.F. (born , died ) Prelate Emeritus of São Félix

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBalsareny, Spain
Ordained PriestOlympic Stadium, Montjuic, Diocese of Barcelona, Spain
Ordained BishopGoiânia, Archdiocese of Goiânia, Goias
Death PlaceSanta Casa, Hospital, Batatais

  • a priest for 68.1 years
  • a bishop for 48.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c1: CB, 10 May 2019
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 17, Number 878
  • d: CB, 8 Aug 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 9 Aug 2020

Quantcast