Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Pasquale Cascio

Archbishop of Sant’Angelo dei Lombardi-Conza-Nusco-Bisaccia, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Nov 1957 Born
23 Jul 198325.6Ordained PriestPriest of Diano-Teggiano, Italy
27 Oct 201254.9AppointedArchbishop of Sant’Angelo dei Lombardi-Conza-Nusco-Bisaccia, Italy
5 Jan 201355.1Ordained BishopArchbishop of Sant’Angelo dei Lombardi-Conza-Nusco-Bisaccia, Italy
6 Jan 201355.1InstalledArchbishop of Sant’Angelo dei Lombardi-Conza-Nusco-Bisaccia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Pasquale Cascio
Archbishop Pasquale Cascio (born ) Archbishop of Sant’Angelo dei Lombardi-Conza-Nusco-Bisaccia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCastelcivita, Diocese of Diano-Teggiano
Ordained BishopSanctuaire San Gerardo Maiella, Basilica, Materdomini di Caposele, Archdiocese of Sant’Angelo dei Lombardi-Conza-Nusco-Bisaccia

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Sant’Angelo dei Lombardi-Conza-Nusco-Bisaccia.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 27 Oct 2012
  • ob: CB, 6 Nov 2012
  • c2+: CB, 30 Dec 2012
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Number 17,622
  • c1/loc: AM, 25 Jun 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 28 Jun 2021

Quantcast