Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Carlos Cárdenas Toro

Bishop of Pasto, Colombia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 May 1968 Born
6 Sep 199729.2Ordained PriestPriest of Cartago, Colombia
26 Jun 201547.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Cali, Colombia
26 Jun 201547.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Nova
25 Jul 201547.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Nova
1 Oct 202052.3AppointedBishop of Pasto, Colombia
21 Nov 202052.4InstalledBishop of Pasto, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Juan Carlos Cárdenas Toro
Bishop Juan Carlos Cárdenas Toro (born ) Bishop of Pasto

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCartago, Diocese of Cartago
Ordained BishopNuestra Señora del Carmen, Cathedral, Cartago, Diocese of Cartago

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Pasto.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 26 Jun 2015
  • ob: CB, 29 Jun 2015
  • c2+: CB, 23 Jul 2015
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 224, Number 18,553
  • ab: Bollettino, 1 Oct 2020
  • i: AM, 19 Nov 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 20 Nov 2020

Quantcast