Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Igino Eugenio Cardinale

Deceased

Apostolic Nuncio to Belgium

Titular Archbishop of Nepte

Apostolic Nuncio to European Community

Apostolic Nuncio to Luxembourg


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Oct 1916Born
13 Jul 194124.7Ordained PriestPriest of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
4 Oct 196346.9AppointedTitular Archbishop of Nepte
4 Oct 196346.9AppointedApostolic Delegate to Great Britain
20 Oct 196347.0Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Nepte
19 Apr 196952.5AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Belgium
9 May 196952.5AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Luxembourg
10 Nov 197054.0AppointedApostolic Nuncio to European Community
10 Nov 197054.0AppointedPermanent Observer to Council of Europe
Mar 1983²66.3ResignedPermanent Observer to Council of Europe
24 Mar 198366.4DiedApostolic Nuncio to Belgium

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Igino Eugenio Cardinale (VIAF: 13555015)
Archbishop Igino Eugenio Cardinale (born , died ) Apostolic Nuncio of Belgium

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFondi, Latina, Archdiocese of Gaeta, Italy
Ordained BishopSan Pietro, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceApostolic Nunciature, Brussels, Archdiocese of Mechelen-Brussel {Malines-Brussels}
Buried Place (Original)Castel di Guido, Cemetery, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 41.6 years
  • a bishop for 19.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1963
  • loc: CL, 20 Feb 2018
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 9, Number 409, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 12, Number 610, Ascendance

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast