Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vicente Camacho y Moya

Deceased

Bishop of Tabasco, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Jun 1886Born
5 Dec 190923.4Ordained PriestPriest
14 Feb 193043.6AppointedBishop of Tabasco, México
7 May 193043.9Ordained BishopBishop of Tabasco, México
18 Feb 194356.6DiedBishop of Tabasco, México

MicroData Summary for Vicente Camacho y Moya
Bishop Vicente Camacho y Moya (born , died ) Bishop of Tabasco

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGuadalajara

  • a priest for 33.2 years
  • a bishop for 12.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: JPG
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1930, Number 24

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast