Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michele Camilleri

Deceased

Bishop of Santorini {Thira}, Greece


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jun 1854Born
1880¹25.5Ordained PriestPriest
1 Jul 190753.0AppointedBishop of Santorini {Thira}, Greece
29 Sep 190753.2Ordained BishopBishop of Santorini {Thira}, Greece
19 Mar 193176.7DiedBishop of Santorini {Thira}, Greece

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Michele Camilleri
Bishop Michele Camilleri (born , died ) Bishop of Santorini {Thira}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCorfu
Ordained BishopSmyrne, Archdiocese of Izmir (Smirne), Turkey

  • a priest for 51.2 years
  • a bishop for 23.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1931
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1932
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1907, Number 53
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 74, Number 5,907

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast