Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pietro Calchi Novati

Deceased

Bishop of Lodi, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Nov 1868Born
9 Aug 189122.7Ordained PriestPriest of Milano {Milan}, Italy
21 Dec 191446.1AppointedBishop of Bobbio, Italy
7 Feb 191546.2Ordained BishopBishop of Bobbio, Italy
8 Jul 192758.6AppointedBishop of Lodi, Italy
19 Jan 192859.1InstalledBishop of Lodi, Italy
11 Jun 195283.5DiedBishop of Lodi, Italy

MicroData Summary for Pietro Calchi Novati
Bishop Pietro Calchi Novati (born , died ) Bishop of Lodi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMilano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}

  • a priest for 60.8 years
  • a bishop for 37.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1915, Number 5
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 88

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast