Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Leopold Brellinger, S.J. †

Deceased

Bishop of Jingxian [Kinghsien], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Jul 1893Born
14 Aug 191320.0ProfessedMember of Society of Jesus
28 Jun 192329.9Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
4 May 193945.7AppointedPrefect of Kinghsien [Jingxian], China
9 Jan 194753.4AppointedBishop of Jingxian [Kinghsien], China
20 Apr 194753.7Ordained BishopBishop of Jingxian [Kinghsien], China
18 Sep 196774.1DiedBishop of Jingxian [Kinghsien], China

MicroData Summary for Leopold Brellinger
Bishop Leopold Brellinger S.J. (born , died ) Bishop of Jingxian [Kinghsien]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceEbelsberg, Diocese of Linz, Austria
Ordained BishopPeking
Death PlaceTaoyuan

  • a priest for 44.2 years
  • a bishop for 20.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1947, Number 25

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast