Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Aloísio Sinésio Bohn

Bishop Emeritus of Santa Cruz do Sul, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Sep 1934 Born
23 Dec 196127.2Ordained PriestPriest
27 Jun 197742.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Brasília, Distrito Federal, Brazil
27 Jun 197742.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Abbir Germaniciana
9 Sep 197742.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Abbir Germaniciana
13 Feb 198045.4AppointedBishop of Novo Hamburgo, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
27 Jun 198651.7AppointedBishop of Santa Cruz do Sul, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
19 May 201075.6RetiredBishop of Santa Cruz do Sul, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Aloísio Sinésio Bohn
Bishop Aloísio Sinésio Bohn (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Santa Cruz do Sul

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMontenegro
Ordained BishopPorto Alegre, Archdiocese of Porto Alegre, Rio Grande do Sul

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Santa Cruz do Sul.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 19 May 2010
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 144
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 58, Number 4,296

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast