Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marc Michel Beaumont

Bishop of Moulins, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Sep 1961 Born
13 May 199028.6Ordained PriestPriest of Cambrai, France
29 Mar 202159.5AppointedBishop of Moulins, France
16 May 202159.6Ordained BishopBishop of Moulins, France

MicroData Summary for Marc Michel Beaumont
Bishop Marc Michel Beaumont (born ) Bishop of Moulins

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCambrai, Archdiocese of Cambrai
Ordained PriestNotre-Dame de Vaucelles, Abbey, Les-Rues-des-Vignes, Archdiocese of Cambrai
Ordained BishopCathedral, Moulins, Diocese of Moulins

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Moulins.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 29 Mar 2021
  • c1/loc: AM, 19 Apr 2021
  • c2+: CB, 20 Apr 2021
  • mn: AJ, 7 Jun 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 8 Jun 2021

Quantcast