Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Robert Emmet Barron

Bishop of Winona-Rochester, Minnesota, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Nov 1959 Born
24 May 198626.5Ordained PriestPriest of Chicago, Illinois, USA
21 Jul 201555.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Los Angeles, California, USA
21 Jul 201555.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Macriana in Mauretania
8 Sep 201555.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Macriana in Mauretania
2 Jun 202262.5AppointedBishop of Winona-Rochester, Minnesota, USA
29 Jul 202262.6InstalledBishop of Winona-Rochester, Minnesota, USA

MicroData Summary for Robert Emmet Barron (VIAF: 36123771)
Bishop Robert Emmet Barron (born ) Bishop of Winona-Rochester

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChicago, Archdiocese of Chicago, Illinois
Ordained PriestHoly Name, Cathedral, Chicago, Archdiocese of Chicago, Illinois
Ordained BishopOur Lady of the Angels, Cathedral, Los Angeles, Archdiocese of Los Angeles, California

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Winona-Rochester.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 21 Jul 2015
  • ob: CB, 24 Jul 2015
  • c23: CB, 11 Aug 2015
  • c4: CB, 12 Aug 2015
  • mn: CB, 25 Sep 2015
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 224, Number 18,571
  • c1: CB, 17 May 2022
  • ab: Bollettino, 2 Jun 2022
  • i: CB, 2 Jun 2022

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2022
Code: web_b, v3.3.3, 16 Jun 2022; Data: 9 Oct 2022