Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luis Alberto Barrera Pacheco, M.C.C.I.

Bishop of Callao, Peru


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Nov 1966 Born
5 May 199124.4ProfessedMember of Comboni Missionaries of the Heart of Jesus
19 Nov 199428.0Solemn VowsMember of Comboni Missionaries of the Heart of Jesus
10 Jun 199528.5Ordained PriestPriest of Comboni Missionaries of the Heart of Jesus
25 Oct 201649.9AppointedBishop of Tarma, Peru
18 Dec 201650.0Ordained BishopBishop of Tarma, Peru
17 Apr 202154.4AppointedBishop of Callao, Peru
26 May 202154.5InstalledBishop of Callao, Peru

MicroData Summary for Luis Alberto Barrera Pacheco
Bishop Luis Alberto Barrera Pacheco M.C.C.I. (born ) Bishop of Callao

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGorgor, Cajatambo, Diocese of Huacho
Ordained BishopSanta Ana, Cathedral, Tarma, Diocese of Tarma

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Callao.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 25 Oct 2016
  • ob: CB, 5 Nov 2016
  • c2+: CB, 3 Dec 2016
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 230, Number 19,227
  • ab: Bollettino, 17 Apr 2021
  • i: CB, 14 May 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 15 May 2021

Quantcast