Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Filomeno Gonzales Bactol

Bishop Emeritus of Naval, Philippines


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Nov 1939 Born
6 Apr 196828.3Ordained PriestPriest of Palo, Philippines
29 Jul 198141.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Palo, Philippines
29 Jul 198141.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Germaniciana
15 Oct 198141.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Germaniciana
29 Nov 198849.0AppointedBishop of Naval, Philippines
13 Oct 201777.8RetiredBishop of Naval, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Filomeno Gonzales Bactol
Bishop Filomeno Gonzales Bactol (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Naval

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCarigara
Ordained BishopTransfiguration, Cathedral, Palo, Archdiocese of Palo

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Naval.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 13 Oct 2017
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 71, Number 5,672

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast