Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luis da Anunciação Azevedo, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Angola e Congo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Oct 1721³Born
7 Jun 174422.6Ordained DeaconDeacon of Order of Friars Preachers
19 Sep 174422.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
21 Mar 177149.4SelectedBishop of Angola e Congo
17 Jun 177149.6ConfirmedBishop of Angola e Congo
28 Oct 177150.0Ordained BishopBishop of Angola e Congo
8 Nov 178463.0ResignedBishop of Angola e Congo
19 Apr 178967.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Angola e Congo

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Luis da Anunciação Azevedo
Bishop Luis da Anunciação Azevedo O.P. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Angola e Congo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLisboa, Patriarchate of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal
Ordained BishopFranciscan, Church, Cenáculo, Patriarchate of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal
Death PlaceLisboa, Patriarchate of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal

  • a priest for 44.5 years
  • a bishop for 17.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: CB
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 111
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1771, Number 24
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 179

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast