Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Roger-Émile Aubry, C.SS.R. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Reyes, Bolivia

Titular Bishop of Arena


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Apr 1923Born
7 Oct 194320.4ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
24 Feb 194925.8Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
14 Jun 197350.1AppointedVicar Apostolic of Reyes, Bolivia
14 Jun 197350.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Arena
16 Sep 197350.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Arena
1 May 199976.0RetiredVicar Apostolic of Reyes, Bolivia
17 Feb 201086.8DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Reyes, Bolivia

MicroData Summary for Roger-Émile Aubry
Bishop Roger-Émile Aubry C.SS.R. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Reyes

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMont Faucon, Switzerland
Ordained BishopReyes, Vicariate Apostolic of Reyes

  • a priest for 60.9 years
  • a bishop for 36.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 122
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 204, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 22, Number 1,228

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast