Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Savarimuthu Arokiaraj

Bishop of Tiruchirapalli, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Oct 1954 Born
8 Jan 198126.2Ordained PriestPriest of Tiruchirapalli, India
29 Jun 202166.6AppointedBishop of Tiruchirapalli, India
15 Aug 202166.8Ordained BishopBishop of Tiruchirapalli, India

MicroData Summary for Savarimuthu Arokiaraj
Bishop Savarimuthu Arokiaraj (born ) Bishop of Tiruchirapalli

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLalapettai, Diocese of Tiruchirapalli
Ordained BishopSt. Mary's, Cathedral, Tiruchirapalli, Diocese of Tiruchirapalli

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Tiruchirapalli.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 29 Jun 2021
  • ob: CB, 17 Jul 2021
  • c2+: CB, 31 Jul 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 15 Aug 2021

Quantcast