Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Devadass Ambrose Mariadoss

Bishop of Tanjore, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Oct 1947 Born
5 Aug 197426.8Ordained PriestPriest of Tanjore, India
28 Jun 199749.7AppointedBishop of Tanjore, India
24 Sep 199749.9Ordained BishopBishop of Tanjore, India
14 Jul 201870.7AppointedApostolic Administrator of Tiruchirapalli, India
15 Aug 202173.8CeasedApostolic Administrator of Tiruchirapalli, India

MicroData Summary for Devadass Ambrose Mariadoss
Bishop Devadass Ambrose Mariadoss (born ) Bishop of Tanjore

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAmmapet
Ordained BishopSacred Heart, Cathedral, Tanjore, Diocese of Tanjore

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Tanjore.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 150, Number 13,149
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 218, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • aadm: CB, 14 Jul 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 15 Aug 2021

Quantcast