Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Devair Araújo da Fonseca

Bishop of Piracicaba, Sao Paulo, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Feb 1968 Born
20 Dec 199830.8Ordained PriestPriest of Franca, Sao Paulo, Brazil
10 Dec 201446.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of São Paulo, Brazil
10 Dec 201446.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Uzalis
1 Feb 201547.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Uzalis
11 Nov 202052.7AppointedBishop of Piracicaba, Sao Paulo, Brazil
16 Jan 202152.9InstalledBishop of Piracicaba, Sao Paulo, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Devair Araújo da Fonseca
Bishop Devair Araújo da Fonseca (born ) Bishop of Piracicaba

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFranca, Diocese of Franca, Sao Paulo
Ordained BishopEstádio Pedro Murila Fuentes ou Pedrocão, Franca, Diocese of Franca, Sao Paulo

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Piracicaba.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 10 Dec 2014
  • ob: CB, 10 Dec 2014
  • c2+: CB, 12 Dec 2014
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 222, Number 18,361
  • ab: Bollettino, 11 Nov 2020
  • i: AM, 19 Nov 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 20 Nov 2020

Quantcast