Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Peter Iorzuul Adoboh

Deceased

Bishop of Katsina-Ala, Nigeria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Apr 1958Born
30 Jun 198426.2Ordained PriestPriest of Makurdi, Nigeria
29 Dec 201254.7AppointedBishop of Katsina-Ala, Nigeria
23 Feb 201354.8Ordained BishopBishop of Katsina-Ala, Nigeria
14 Feb 202061.8DiedBishop of Katsina-Ala, Nigeria

MicroData Summary for Peter Iorzuul Adoboh
Bishop Peter Iorzuul Adoboh (born , died ) Bishop of Katsina-Ala

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTse-Kucha
Ordained BishopAkume Atongo Stadium, Katsina-Ala, Diocese of Katsina-Ala
Death PlaceSt. Vincent's, Cemetery, Abuja, Archdiocese of Abuja

  • a priest for 35.6 years
  • a bishop for 6.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 29 Dec 2012
  • ob: CB, 24 Feb 2013
  • c2+: CB, 28 Feb 2013
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 213, Number 17,659
  • d: CB, 15 Feb 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast