Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Sebastian Adayanthrath

Bishop of Mandya (Syro-Malabar), India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Apr 1957 Born
18 Dec 198326.7Ordained PriestPriest
4 Feb 200244.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Ernakulam-Angamaly (Syro-Malabar), India
4 Feb 200244.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Macriana Maior
20 Apr 200245.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Macriana Maior
30 Aug 201962.4AppointedBishop of Mandya (Syro-Malabar), India
8 Sep 201962.4InstalledBishop of Mandya (Syro-Malabar), India

MicroData Summary for Sebastian Adayanthrath
Bishop Sebastian Adayanthrath (born ) Bishop of Mandya

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVaikom
Ordained BishopSaint Mary, Cathedral Basilica, Emakulam, Archdiocese of Ernakulam-Angamaly (Syro-Malabar)

Please contact the Bishop through the Eparchy of Mandya (Syro-Malabar).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 205, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 167, Number 14,176
  • ab: Bollettino, 30 Aug 2019
  • i: AM, 24 Sep 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast