Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas Eusebios Naickamparampil

Bishop of Parassala (Syro-Malankara), India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jun 1961 Born
29 Dec 198625.5Ordained PriestPriest of Trivandrum (Syro-Malankara), India
14 Jul 201049.1AppointedApostolic Exarch of United States of America (Syro-Malankara)
14 Jul 201049.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Lares
21 Sep 201049.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lares
3 Oct 201049.3InstalledApostolic Exarch of United States of America (Syro-Malankara)
4 Jan 201654.5AppointedBishop of St. Mary, Queen of Peace (Syro-Malankara), USA
5 Aug 201756.1AppointedBishop of Parassala (Syro-Malankara), India
23 Sep 201756.2InstalledBishop of Parassala (Syro-Malankara), India

MicroData Summary for Thomas Eusebios Naickamparampil
Bishop Thomas Eusebios Naickamparampil (born ) Bishop of Parassala

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMylapra, Archeparchy of Trivandrum (Syro-Malankara)
Ordained BishopSaint Mary, Cathedral, Trivandum, Archeparchy of Trivandrum (Syro-Malankara)

Please contact the Bishop through the Eparchy of Parassala (Syro-Malankara).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 14 Jul 2010
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 203, Number 16,798
  • ab: Bollettino, 4 Jan 2016
  • ab: Bollettino, 5 Aug 2017
  • i: CB, 5 Aug 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast