Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joshuah Ignathios Kizhakkeveettil

Bishop of Mavelikara (Syro-Malankara), India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 May 1950 Born
2 Apr 197827.8Ordained PriestPriest of Trivandrum (Syro-Malankara), India
15 Apr 199847.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Trivandrum (Syro-Malankara), India
15 Apr 199847.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Nigizubi
29 Jun 199848.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Nigizubi
2 Jan 200756.6AppointedBishop of Mavelikara (Syro-Malankara), India
16 Feb 200756.7InstalledBishop of Mavelikara (Syro-Malankara), India

MicroData Summary for Joshuah Ignathios Kizhakkeveettil
Bishop Joshuah Ignathios Kizhakkeveettil (born ) Bishop of Mavelikara

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKizhakketheruvu

Please contact the Bishop through the Eparchy of Mavelikara (Syro-Malankara).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 2 Jan 2007
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Number 13,350

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast