Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Geevarghese Divannasios Ottathengil

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Puthur (Syro-Malankara), India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Nov 1950Born
1962²11.1Converted
20 Apr 197827.4Ordained PriestPriest of Trivandrum (Syro-Malankara), India
28 Oct 197827.9IncardinatedPriest of Battery (Bathery) (Syro-Malankara), India
11 Nov 199646.0AppointedBishop of Battery (Bathery) (Syro-Malankara), India
5 Feb 199746.2Ordained BishopBishop of Battery (Bathery) (Syro-Malankara), India
25 Jan 201059.2AppointedBishop of Puthur (Syro-Malankara), India
24 Jan 201766.2ResignedBishop of Puthur (Syro-Malankara), India
16 Jan 201867.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Puthur (Syro-Malankara), India

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary
Geevarghese Divannasios Ottathengil
Bishop Geevarghese Divannasios Ottathengil
(born , died )
Bishop Emeritus of Puthur

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKunnanthanam, Archeparchy of Trivandrum (Syro-Malankara)
Ordained BishopOpen Air, Sultan's Bathery, Eparchy of Battery (Bathery) (Syro-Malankara)
Death PlaceTiruvalla, Archeparchy of Tiruvalla (Syro-Malankara)
Buried Place (Original)Saint John, Cathedral, Tiruvalla, Archeparchy of Tiruvalla (Syro-Malankara)

  • a priest for 39.7 years
  • a bishop for 20.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

External Link(s):

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 25 Jan 2010
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Number 12,922
  • r: Bollettino, 24 Jan 2017
  • d: CB, 16 Jan 2018
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 238, Necrology (back)
  • loc/c1/inca: CB, 23 Apr 2025

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2025
Code: web_b, v3.4.1, 22 Mar 2025; Data: 28 Apr 2025