Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Baselios Cleemis (Isaac) Cardinal Thottunkal

Major Archbishop of Trivandrum (Syro-Malankarese)

Cardinal-Priest of San Gregorio VII


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Jun 1959 BornNedungadappally
11 Jun 198627.0Ordained PriestPriest of Battery (Bathery) (Syro-Malankarese), India
18 Jun 200142.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Trivandrum (Syro-Malankarese), India
18 Jun 200142.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Chaialum
15 Aug 200142.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Chaialum
11 Sep 200344.2AppointedBishop of Tiruvalla (Syro-Malankarese), India
2 Oct 200344.3InstalledBishop of Tiruvalla (Syro-Malankarese), India
15 May 200646.9AppointedArchbishop of Tiruvalla (Syro-Malankarese), India
10 Jun 200647.0InstalledArchbishop of Tiruvalla (Syro-Malankarese), India
8 Feb 200747.6SelectedMajor Archbishop of Trivandrum (Syro-Malankarese), India
10 Feb 200747.7ConfirmedMajor Archbishop of Trivandrum (Syro-Malankarese), India
5 Mar 200747.7InstalledMajor Archbishop of Trivandrum (Syro-Malankarese), India
24 Nov 201253.4Elevated to Cardinal
24 Nov 201253.4AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Gregorio VII
19 May 201353.9InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Gregorio VII

MicroData Summary for Baselios Cleemis (Isaac) Thottunkal:
Cardinal Baselios Cleemis (Isaac) Thottunkal (born ) Major Archbishop of Trivandrum

Please contact the Cardinal through the Archeparchy of Trivandrum (Syro-Malankarese).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 15 May 2006
  • ab: Bollettino, 10 Feb 2007
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 164, Number 14,019
  • card: Bollettino, 24 Oct 2012
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church
  • ab: Bollettino, 24 Nov 2012
  • i: Bollettino, 14 May 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013