Date | Age | Event | Title |
---|---|---|---|
10 Nov 1955 | Born | ||
18 Dec 1982 | 27.1 | Ordained Priest | Priest |
7 May 2022 | 66.4 | Confirmed | Auxiliary Bishop of Trivandrum (Syro-Malankara), India |
7 May 2022 | 66.4 | Appointed | Titular Bishop of Canatha |
15 Jul 2022 | 66.6 | Ordained Bishop | Titular Bishop of Canatha |
(WikiData: Q111901318)
Bishop
Mathew Polycarpos
Manakkarakavil
(born )
Auxiliary Bishop
of Trivandrum
Event | Place |
---|---|
Ordained Bishop | St. Mary's, Cathedral, Pattom |
Please contact the Bishop through the Archeparchy of Trivandrum (Syro-Malankara).
|
|
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:
|
Source(s):
|
Home |
Countries |
Religious Orders |
Popes |
Holy See |
Roman Curia |
Cardinals by Rank
| ||
About Catholic-Hierarchy | Terminology/Site Help | |
Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024 Code: web_b, v3.3.5, 31 Dec 2023; Data: 25 Feb 2024 |
✠