Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Francistown

Dioecesis Francistaunensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 2 October 2017
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Pretoria
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Botswana
  • Square Kilometers: 472,995 (182,694 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Catholic Secretariat, St. Francis House, P.O. Box 702, Tsie Road 14061 Area W, Francistown, Botswana
  • Telephone: 2413.601
  • Fax: 2417.183

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Francistown
27 June 1998ErectedDiocese of Gaborone Vicariate Apostolic of Francistown (erected)
5 June 2007Metropolitan ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Francistown (from Bloemfontein)
Diocese of Francistown
2 October 2017ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Francistown Diocese of Francistown

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of Francistown
199917,262704,7802.4%114151,15020199ap2000
200017,506703,8022.5%314171,029232210ap2001
200117,294701,5072.5%31619910192310ap2002
200217,544705,7742.5%81220877152313ap2003
200317,896801,7292.2%81422813162315ap2004
200420,316831,2042.4%101525812172815ap2005
201019,094847,0002.3%131831615222817ap2011
201416,456920,6311.8%111223715162817ap2015
Diocese of Francistown
201717,0001,200,0001.4%2665312817bul:2Oct2017

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_d, v3.2.0, 12 Sep 2017; Data: 2 Oct 2017