Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Falconio

Deceased

Bishop of Ortona a Mare e Campli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Jun 1663BornCivita Ducale
29 Oct 169027.4Ordained PriestPriest
20 Dec 171754.5AppointedBishop of Ortona a Mare e Campli, Italy
2 Jan 171854.6Ordained BishopBishop of Ortona a Mare e Campli, Italy
16 Mar 173066.8DiedBishop of Ortona a Mare e Campli, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Falconio:
Bishop Giuseppe Falconio (born , died ) Bishop of Ortona a Mare e Campli

  • a priest for 39.4 years
  • a bishop for 12.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1729
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 298

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013