Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antimo degli Atti

Deceased

Bishop of Ortona a Mare e Campli, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1580¹Born
1 Jul 162444.5AppointedBishop of Ortona a Mare e Campli, Italy
15 Sep 162444.7Ordained BishopBishop of Ortona a Mare e Campli, Italy
1 Oct 164060.7DiedBishop of Ortona a Mare e Campli, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antimo degli Atti
Bishop Antimo degli Atti (born 1580, died ) Bishop of Ortona a Mare e Campli

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCorneto

  • a bishop for 16.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 266
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 86, Number 511
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1624, Number 39

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast