Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Domenico Rebiba

Deceased

Bishop of Catania, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
8 Nov 1570AppointedBishop of Ortona, Italy
19 Nov 1570Ordained BishopBishop of Ortona, Italy
11 Dec 1595AppointedBishop of Catania, Italy
6 Feb 1604DiedBishop of Catania, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Domenico Rebiba
Bishop Giovanni Domenico Rebiba (died ) Bishop of Catania

EventPlace
Ordained BishopChapel of the Consecrator, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 33.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 141
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 263, and Page 159
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 18, Number 67
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1570, Number 21

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.7, 12 Sep 2017; Data: 7 Nov 2017