Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Konongo-Mampong

Dioecesis Konongensis-Mamponganus



Show: All | General Information | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Joseph Osei-Bonsu, Bishop

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Erected: 3 March 1995
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Kumasi
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Ghana
  • Square Kilometers: 14,056 (5,429 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.konongo-mampong-diocese.org/
  • Mailing Address: Bishop's House, P.O. Box 382, Mampong, Ashanti, Ghana
  • Telephone: (0561)22101
  • Fax: (same)

Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
3 March 1995ErectedDiocese of Kumasi
Diocese of Sunyani
Diocese of Konongo-Mampong (erected)
17 January 2002Metropolitan ChangedDiocese of Konongo-Mampong (from Cape Coast)
28 December 2007Territory LostDiocese of Konongo-Mampong
Diocese of Sunyani
Diocese of Techiman (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
199969,2511,112,8356.2%2710371,871544624ap2000
200065,5611,112,8355.9%2813411,599614824ap2001
200175,4401,112,8356.8%2916451,676774325ap2002
200265,5611,112,8355.9%3119501,311903927ap2003
200390,3201,112,8358.1%3420541,672874028ap2004
200495,4871,258,4957.6%3719561,705793730ap2005
200693,8471,314,0007.1%4519641,466844233ap2007
200772,1451,012,9997.1%60197991342729bul:28Dec07

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2011
code: v2.7.5, 23 Nov 2011; data: 3 Dec 2011