Date | Age | Event | Title |
---|---|---|---|
10 Nov 1856 | Born | ||
Nov 1884³ | 27.9 | Ordained Priest | Priest of Congregation of the Holy Spirit |
23 Aug 1885 | 28.7 | Professed | Priest of Congregation of the Holy Spirit |
1911² | 54.1 | Appointed | Prefect of Northern Katanga {Katanga Settentrionale}, Congo (Dem. Rep.) |
1922² | 65.1 | Resigned | Prefect of Northern Katanga {Katanga Settentrionale}, Congo (Dem. Rep.) |
1 Mar 1938 | 81.3 | Died | Prefect Emeritus of Northern Katanga {Katanga Settentrionale}, Congo (Dem. Rep.) |
Event | Place |
---|---|
Birth Place | Marcke-lez-Courtrai |
Death Place | Ingelmunster |
|
Source(s):
|
Home |
Countries |
Religious Orders |
Popes |
Holy See |
Roman Curia |
Cardinals by Rank
| ||
About Catholic-Hierarchy | Terminology/Site Help | |
Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024 Code: web_b, v3.3.5, 31 Dec 2023; Data: 25 Feb 2024 |
✠