Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Alexis Jean Augustin Bachelot, SS.CC. †

Deceased

Prefect of Sandwich Islands, Hawaii


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Feb 1796BornSaint-Cyr, France
1813²16.8ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Sacred Hearts of Jesus and Mary
1820²23.8Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Sacred Hearts of Jesus and Mary
3 Dec 182529.7AppointedPrefect of Sandwich Islands, Hawaii, USA
5 Dec 183741.7DiedPrefect of Sandwich Islands, Hawaii, USA

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Alexis Jean Augustin Bachelot
Father Alexis Jean Augustin Bachelot SS.CC. (born , died ) Prefect of Sandwich Islands

  • a priest for 17.9 years

Source(s):
  • b: CB, 8 Mar 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 9 Mar 2016