Catholic-Hierarchy DC

[Patriotic Bishop John Li Sheng-xue] †

Chinese Patriotic Catholic Association

Not in Union with the Holy See

Deceased

Bishop of Hanzhong [Hanchung], China


Events

DateEventTitle
26 Mar 1959Ordained BishopBishop of Hanzhong [Hanchung], China
20 Jan 1984DiedBishop of Hanzhong [Hanchung], China

MicroData Summary for John Li Sheng-xue
Bishop John Li Sheng-xue (died ) Bishop of Hanzhong [Hanchung]

EventPlace
Ordained BishopChowchich, Diocese of Zhouzhi [Chowchich]

  • a bishop for 24.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 19 Dec 2019
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 150, Number 13,065

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast