Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Francesco Giulianelli, P.I.M.E. †

Deceased

Apostolic Administrator Emeritus of Southern Shensi {Scen-Si Meridionale}, China

Priest of Pontifical Institute for Foreign Missions

Apostolic Administrator of Southern Shensi {Scen-Si Meridionale}

Titular See: (refused nomination as Vicar)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Sep 1831Born
20 Oct 187645.1Ordained PriestPriest of Pontifical Institute for Foreign Missions
1887²55.3AppointedApostolic Administrator of Southern Shensi {Scen-Si Meridionale}, China
188856.3AppointedVicar Apostolic of Southern Shensi {Scen-Si Meridionale}, China
18 Dec 189867.2DiedPriest of Pontifical Institute for Foreign Missions

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ⁸ Did Not Take Effect

MicroData Summary for Francesco Giulianelli
Father Francesco Giulianelli P.I.M.E. (born , died ) Apostolic Administrator Emeritus of Southern Shensi {Scen-Si Meridionale}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceKulupa

  • a priest for 22.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 1 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast