Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Gregorio Antonucci, M.E.R. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Southern Shensi {Scen-Si Meridionale}, China

Titular See: (never consecrated)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Oct 1846Born
20 Dec 187327.1Ordained PriestPriest
6 Aug 188740.7AppointedVicar Apostolic of Southern Shensi {Scen-Si Meridionale}, China
18 Feb 189548.3ResignedVicar Apostolic of Southern Shensi {Scen-Si Meridionale}, China
14 Aug 190255.7DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Southern Shensi {Scen-Si Meridionale}, China

MicroData Summary for Gregorio Antonucci
Father Gregorio Antonucci M.E.R. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Southern Shensi {Scen-Si Meridionale}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSubiaco, Italy

  • a priest for 28.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 71
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1887

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 20 May 2017