Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Josef Chrysostomus Pauer

Deceased

Bishop of Sankt Pölten


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Jun 1756³BornWien
177417.5ProfessedMember of Clerics Regular of St. Paul
19 Sep 177822.2Ordained DeaconDeacon of Clerics Regular of St. Paul
29 May 177922.9Ordained PriestPriest of Clerics Regular of St. Paul
18 Nov 180246.3IncardinatedPriest of Sankt Pölten, Austria
24 Apr 181558.8AppointedBishop of Austria, Military
25 May 181861.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Dulma
2 Aug 181862.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Dulma
10 Nov 182367.3SelectedBishop of Sankt Pölten, Austria
3 May 182467.8ConfirmedBishop of Sankt Pölten, Austria
13 Jun 182467.9InstalledBishop of Sankt Pölten, Austria
19 Dec 182670.4DiedBishop of Sankt Pölten, Austria

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Josef Chrysostomus Pauer
Bishop Josef Chrysostomus Pauer (born , died ) Bishop of Sankt Pölten

  • a priest for 47.5 years
  • a bishop for 8.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 181, and Page 216
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1818, Number 69

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 6 Jun 2016