Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Grzegorz Tomasz Ziegler, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Linz


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Mar 1770³BornKirchheim w Szwabii
3 Jun 179222.2Ordained DeaconDeacon
25 Apr 179323.1ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
25 May 179323.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
5 Feb 182251.9SelectedBishop of Tarnów, Poland
19 Apr 182252.1ConfirmedBishop of Tarnów, Poland
29 Jun 182252.3Ordained BishopBishop of Tarnów, Poland
18 Aug 182252.4InstalledBishop of Tarnów, Poland
16 Apr 182757.1SelectedBishop of Linz, Austria
25 Jun 182757.3ConfirmedBishop of Linz, Austria
9 Sep 182757.5InstalledBishop of Linz, Austria
15 Apr 185282.1DiedBishop of Linz, Austria

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Grzegorz Tomasz Ziegler:
Bishop Grzegorz Tomasz Ziegler O.S.B. (born , died ) Bishop of Linz

  • a priest for 58.9 years
  • a bishop for 29.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Website of the Diocese, 20 May 2011
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 240, and Page 359
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 382

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013