Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Anthony Zhong Changfeng (Zong Changfeng, Song Changfeng)

Deceased

Coadjutor Bishop Emeritus of Kaifeng [Kaifeng], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Sep 1932Born
29 May 197946.7Ordained PriestPriest
13 Jun 199865.7Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Kaifeng [Kaifeng], China
2008²75.3ResignedCoadjutor Bishop of Kaifeng [Kaifeng], China
22 Nov 201179.1DiedCoadjutor Bishop Emeritus of Kaifeng [Kaifeng], China

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Anthony Zhong Changfeng (Zong Changfeng, Song Changfeng)
Bishop Anthony Zhong Changfeng (Zong Changfeng, Song Changfeng) (born , died ) Coadjutor Bishop Emeritus of Kaifeng [Kaifeng]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNanyue Village
Death PlaceNanyue Village

  • a priest for 32.4 years
  • a bishop for 13.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 26 Dec 2019
  • b/c2: Clandestine Epsicopal Ordinations in China, Year 2,018, Number 88
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 242, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast